This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 23:08:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Hatmaker, Bobby Dwane

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Hatmaker, Bobby Dwane. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3854

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hatmaker, Bobby Dwane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Carlos, Christopher John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: T. Gomes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:35 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen, CPD 22-04905

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Hatmaker, Bobby Dwane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Hatmaker, Bobby Dwane; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos, Christopher John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel