This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 22:01:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Hansen, Matthew

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Hansen, Matthew. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A, Worley, Kurt W, Heithecker, Philip H and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0218

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hansen, Matthew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hearne, Susan Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCompliance Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Proof of GPS, proof of enrollment, payment plan, receipt of signed probation order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Additional Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Hearne, Susan Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; CHPC 202100577

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Hansen, Matthew; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Hansen, Matthew; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Hansen, Matthew; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Hansen, Matthew; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hearne, Susan M