This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 21:03:54 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Greunke, James Mitchell

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Greunke, James Mitchell. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Heithecker, Philip H, Worley, Kurt W and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4762

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Greunke, James Mitchell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketJudge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DispositionParole/Post Release Community Supervision; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Parole/Post Release Community Supervision; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 10/07/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 135 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Admitted Violation (PCS/Parole/Mandatory Supervision)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Admit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketParole Reinstated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 10:32 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 0/30/2022, Parole Revoked 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketParole Revoked

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPetition - Revoke State Parole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: petition Filed 09/30/2022; Defendant: Greunke, James Mitchell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Greunke, James Mitchell; 001; Description: PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Statute: 3000.08; Level: Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Latimer, Denver Michael