This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 00:50:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Gray, Billy Ray

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gray, Billy Ray. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Worley, Kurt W and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5692

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Worley, Kurt W

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gray, Billy Ray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Henson, Saul W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDisposition Following Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: Petition Filed 11/5/21; Parole Revoked 12/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFound in Violation of Parole; Comment: Plea entered in 22CF02496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 11/5/21; Parole Revoked 12/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 11/5/21; Parole Revoked 12/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition filed 11/5/21; Parole revoked 12/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition filed 11/05/21; Parole revoked 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 11/05/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPetition - Revoke State Parole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 11/5/21; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Gray, Billy Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Gray, Billy Ray; 001; Description: PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Statute: 3000.08; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henson, Saul W