This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 20:03:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. GRANGER, BRIAN BRADLEY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRANGER, BRIAN BRADLEY. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2445

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

GRANGER, BRIAN BRADLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards; CPD 22-1735

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: GRANGER, BRIAN BRADLEY; 003; Description: VC12500(a)-M- Driving Without Valid License; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: GRANGER, BRIAN BRADLEY; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: GRANGER, BRIAN BRADLEY; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant