This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 22:11:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Gonzalez, Frank Anthony

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gonzalez, Frank Anthony. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Gingery, Virginia and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4765

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Gingery, Virginia

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gonzalez, Frank Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketIgnition Interlock Device

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; 001; VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Not Guilty; 001; VC14601.2(d)(2) - Driving When Privilege Suspended or Revoked for DUI Conviction After a Prior; Deny

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo BCSO 22-06649

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Gonzalez, Frank Anthony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Frank Anthony; 001; Description: VC14601.2(d)(2) - Driving When Privilege Suspended or Revoked for DUI Conviction After a Prior; Statute: 14601.2(d)(2); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Frank Anthony; 001; Description: VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel