This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 22:22:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Gonzales, Anthony Enrique

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gonzales, Anthony Enrique. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0019

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gonzales, Anthony Enrique

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Henson, Saul W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Terminal Sentence; Comment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Sears; CPD 21-07848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Gonzales, Anthony Enrique

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzales, Anthony Enrique; 001; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henson, Saul W