This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 04:13:54 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Garcia-Ponce, Cameron Edward

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Garcia-Ponce, Cameron Edward. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1609

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Garcia-Ponce, Cameron Edward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos, Christopher John

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Setting/Resetting; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Information to be Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; UIC2101(a)-F- Providing False Information For Unemployment Benefits; Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Preliminary Hearing and Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketFingerprint Form; Comment: submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Last Continuance; Time Estimate; 45 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Address unisgned O/R conditions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney M. Tufaro, BCDA 22INV0001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Garcia-Ponce, Cameron Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Garcia-Ponce, Cameron Edward; 001; Description: UIC2101(a)-F- Providing False Information For Unemployment Benefits; Statute: 2101(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos, Christopher John