This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 20:05:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Garcia, Marcia Lynn

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Garcia, Marcia Lynn. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2361

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Garcia, Marcia Lynn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Henson, Saul W

Carlos, Christopher John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 45 Minute Time Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; UIC2101(a)-F- Providing False Information For Unemployment Benefits; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketConflict Counsel Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney M. Tufaro; BCDA 22INV0001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Garcia, Marcia Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Garcia, Marcia Lynn; 001; Description: UIC2101(a)-F- Providing False Information For Unemployment Benefits; Statute: 2101(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos, Christopher John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henson, Saul W