This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 22:02:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. GALVAN, ALINA CORINA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GALVAN, ALINA CORINA. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Heithecker, Philip H, Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0355

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

GALVAN, ALINA CORINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Cardoza, Anthony R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCompliance Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Proof of completion of GPS, payment plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketProbation Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School; Comment: Solutions For Positive Choices-3M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; CPD 21-7636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: GALVAN, ALINA CORINA; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: GALVAN, ALINA CORINA; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: GALVAN, ALINA CORINA; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: GALVAN, ALINA CORINA; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardoza, Anthony R