This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 22:21:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Flucard, John Edward

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Flucard, John Edward. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A, Caraway, Corie J and Giordano, Raymond J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4558

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

Giordano, Raymond J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Flucard, John Edward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - State Prison

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 001; PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 11/02/2022; Term Type: Upper Term; Term: 6 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 49 Days; Conduct Credit: 48 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC4019; Comment: Total unstayed term is 7 years, 4 months with counts 2, 3 and 4.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; PC487(d)(2)-F- Grand Theft Of Firearm; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 003; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 004; VC2800.2(a)-F- Evading An Officer With Willful Disregard; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketFingerprint Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: Address bail amount

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 004; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 004; Description: VC2800.2(a)-F- Evading An Officer With Willful Disregard; Statute: 2800.2(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 003; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 003; Description: PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 002; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 002; Description: PC667(a)(1) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction: Additional 5 Years Each Prior; Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 002; Description: PC487(d)(2)-F- Grand Theft Of Firearm; Statute: 487(d)(2); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 001; Description: PC667(a)(1) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction: Additional 5 Years Each Prior; Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Flucard, John Edward; 001; Description: PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony 1st Degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher