This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 22:06:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Faga, Billy Joe

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Faga, Billy Joe. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3172

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Faga, Billy Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos, Christopher John

Brennan, John-Paul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Subpoenaed Records Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSubpoenaed Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: 30 min time est

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney M. Tufaro, CPD 22-03985

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Faga, Billy Joe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Faga, Billy Joe; 001; Description: PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos, Christopher John