This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 21:03:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Elmore, Darwyn Alexander

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Elmore, Darwyn Alexander. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Heithecker, Philip H and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1949

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Elmore, Darwyn Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Court Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 06/24/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 4 Days; Comment: Programs Authorized; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 05/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketReferral to DUI Program

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Elmore, Darwyn Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards; UP 22-0083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Elmore, Darwyn Alexander; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Elmore, Darwyn Alexander; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Elmore, Darwyn Alexander; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Elmore, Darwyn Alexander; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W