This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 21:23:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Duer-Roberts, Eric Scott

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Duer-Roberts, Eric Scott. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J, Heithecker, Philip H and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0223

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

Heithecker, Philip H

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Duer-Roberts, Eric Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Williams, Benjamin A.

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Proof of enrollment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Assignment Conference; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketProbation Order; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Comment: Amended- signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionFormal Probation; 001; PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Formal Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/31/2023; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 01/31/2023; Concurrent: any other sentence; Term Type: Jail; Term: 60 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 002; PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; No Contest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney N. Bringsjord CPD 23-00261

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Duer-Roberts, Eric Scott; 002; Description: PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Duer-Roberts, Eric Scott; 001; Description: PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less