This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 00:09:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Dudman, David Andrew

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dudman, David Andrew. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1711

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dudman, David Andrew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Caraway, Christopher W.

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Civil Compromise Being Explored

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C. Caraway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC530.5(c)(1)-M- Possession Of Identifying Information With Intent To Defraud; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Furry; CPD 22-001926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Dudman, David Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Dudman, David Andrew; 001; Description: PC530.5(c)(1)-M- Possession Of Identifying Information With Intent To Defraud; Statute: 530.5(c)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.