This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 23:09:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Duarte, Brandon Dale

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Duarte, Brandon Dale. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3169

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Duarte, Brandon Dale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Stark-Modlin, PPD 22-0543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Duarte, Brandon Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Brandon Dale; 003; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Brandon Dale; 002; Description: HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11350(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Brandon Dale; 001; Description: PC530.5(c)(1)-M- Possession Of Identifying Information With Intent To Defraud; Statute: 530.5(c)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant