This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 22:01:50 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Duarte, Andrew Julian

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Duarte, Andrew Julian. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0219

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Duarte, Andrew Julian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Caraway, Christopher W.

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: PC977 authorized

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; PC21310-M- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC21310-M- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; PC647(f)-M- Public Intoxication: Drugs And Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC21310-M- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney DJ Lee CPD 22-000216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Duarte, Andrew Julian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Andrew Julian; 002; Description: PC647(f)-M- Public Intoxication: Drugs And Alcohol; Statute: 647(f); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Andrew Julian; 001; Description: PC21310-M- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Statute: 21310; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Latimer, Denver Michael