This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 22:03:57 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Dryden, Anthony William

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dryden, Anthony William. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0352

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dryden, Anthony William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Not Guilty; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Deny; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Not Guilty; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Deny; 003; VC20002(a)-M- Hit And Run Property Damage; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Dryden, Anthony William; Public Defender: Fahey, Michael W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Dryden, Anthony William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; OPD 21-4831 With Copy Of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dryden, Anthony William; 003; Description: VC20002(a)-M- Hit And Run Property Damage; Statute: 20002(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dryden, Anthony William; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dryden, Anthony William; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dryden, Anthony William; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dryden, Anthony William; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W