This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/09/2022 at 00:38:06 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. DRUEHL, JESSE COLIN

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DRUEHL, JESSE COLIN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Reilley, James F, Caraway, Corie J and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5691

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

Merrifield, Kimberly

Reilley, James F

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

DRUEHL, JESSE COLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Aladdin Bail Bonds, # SV25-5215562, $18,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to Butte County Sheriff's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketOrder on Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Declaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant; Comment: Sent to DA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Reilley, James F; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Notice to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Furry BCSO 21-05790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • ChargeCharges: DRUEHL, JESSE COLIN; 002; Description: PC368(d)-M-Theft From Elder Or Dependent Adult; Statute: 368(d); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • ChargeCharges: DRUEHL, JESSE COLIN; 001; Description: PC530.5(a)-F- Identity Theft; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant