This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 22:05:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Dollar, Troy James

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dollar, Troy James. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Worley, Kurt W and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3171

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dollar, Troy James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Need Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Dollar, Troy James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; BCSO 22-03180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Dollar, Troy James; 001; Description: PC25400(a)(1)-M- Having Concealed Firearm In Vehicle; Statute: 25400(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant