This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 21:01:00 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Dalton, Eric Kirk

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dalton, Eric Kirk. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4615

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dalton, Eric Kirk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Logs from 09/22/22; If Not in Compliance then Defendant Needs to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Logs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: M. Fahey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney L Butzow; CPD 22-05857

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Dalton, Eric Kirk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Dalton, Eric Kirk; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Dalton, Eric Kirk; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Dalton, Eric Kirk; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Dalton, Eric Kirk; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew