This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:01:27 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Crownover, Everette Charles

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Crownover, Everette Charles. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5992

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Crownover, Everette Charles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to PPD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: VC40508(a) Failure to Appear added 12/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • ChargeCrownover, Everette Charles; VC40508(a)-M- Failure To Appear On Written Promise/Granted Continuance; Statute: 40508(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Rust PPD 21-0931 With Copy of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • ChargeCrownover, Everette Charles; VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant