This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/17/2022 at 22:04:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Heithecker, Philip H and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2460

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder for Forfeiture of Weapon PC18000-18005-18010; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 005; PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/11/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 08/19/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Consecutive: Consecutive with counts 1 and 4.; Term Type: Jail; Term: 15 Days; Comment: A total term of 32 days for all counts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 004; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/11/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 08/19/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Consecutive: Consecutive to counts 1 and 5.; Term Type: Jail; Term: 15 Days; Comment: A total term of 32 days with all counts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/11/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 08/19/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Consecutive: Consecutive with counts 4 and 5.; Term Type: Jail; Term: 2 Days; Comment: 48 Hours for count 1, A total term of 32 days for all counts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal; 003; VC23103(a)-M- Reckless Driving On Highway; Dismissal; 004; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 005; PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 006; PC242-M- Battery; Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 004; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; No Contest; 005; PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order; Comment: 2nd Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice To Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards CPD 21-07648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN; 006; Description: PC242-M- Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN; 005; Description: PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Statute: 25850(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN; 004; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN; 003; Description: VC23103(a)-M- Reckless Driving On Highway; Statute: 23103(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: COOPER, JEFFREY AUSTIN; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W