This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 19:02:21 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. COOMBE, PETER CHARLES

Case Summary

On 03/24/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COOMBE, PETER CHARLES. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1237

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

COOMBE, PETER CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hearne, Susan Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: HIDE suitability; logs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketPlea Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Trail 22CM03773, 22CM05956

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards, CHPC 9241-2022-00500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: COOMBE, PETER CHARLES; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: COOMBE, PETER CHARLES; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less