This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 23:01:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Coleman, Will Milton Allen

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Coleman, Will Milton Allen. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3709

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Coleman, Will Milton Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Davis, Grady M

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; VC2800.1(a)-M- Evading An Officer; Not Guilty; 002; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Not Guilty; 003; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 004; HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: Ben Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Coleman, Will Milton Allen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Prop 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney A Insul; PPD 22-0476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Coleman, Will Milton Allen; 004; Description: HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11350(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Coleman, Will Milton Allen; 003; Description: HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Coleman, Will Milton Allen; 002; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Coleman, Will Milton Allen; 001; Description: VC2800.1(a)-M- Evading An Officer; Statute: 2800.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davis, Grady M