This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 00:28:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Clarkhill, Jeremiah Lee

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Clarkhill, Jeremiah Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Caraway, Corie J, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Deems, Michael R and Giordano, Raymond J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3584

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

Giordano, Raymond J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Clarkhill, Jeremiah Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Santana, Jesse Isaias

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: **Address bail previously posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Aladdin Bail Bonds SV150-5243202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order; Comment: Bail Bond Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketRuling on Disqualification - Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Comment: Honored

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Disqualification-Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Comment: Written

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: Matthew Bently

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Appearance of counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Clarkhill, Jeremiah Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney M. Tufaro BCSO 22-04471

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Aladdin Bail Bonds SV100-5228657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Clarkhill, Jeremiah Lee; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Clarkhill, Jeremiah Lee; 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Santana, Jesse Isaias

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher