This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 22:00:45 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Chanh, Gnia Nmn

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Chanh, Gnia Nmn. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Deems, Michael R and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3210

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Deems, Michael R

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Chanh, Gnia Nmn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Bench Warrant Issued to Butte County Sheriff's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: need time estimate; with logs and O/R review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; VC4463(a)(1)-F- Alters/Forges Registration/License/Permit With Intent To Defraud; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: signed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: Amended unsigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Dupre-Tokos, PK 220630N-0131

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Chanh, Gnia Nmn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Chanh, Gnia Nmn; 001; Description: VC4463(a)(1)-F- Alters/Forges Registration/License/Permit With Intent To Defraud; Statute: 4463(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher