This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:01:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Cervantes, Lisa Marie

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Cervantes, Lisa Marie. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Worley, Kurt W and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5993

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Worley, Kurt W

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cervantes, Lisa Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Worley, Kurt W; 001; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 002; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty; 003; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Not Guilty; 004; PC853.7-M- Failure To Appear; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Aladdin Bail Bonds SV5-5187831

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • ChargeCervantes, Lisa Marie; PC853.7-M- Failure To Appear; Statute: 853.7; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Rust PPD 21-0969

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • ChargeCervantes, Lisa Marie; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • ChargeCervantes, Lisa Marie; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • ChargeCervantes, Lisa Marie; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant