This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 22:12:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ceragioli, Mary E

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ceragioli, Mary E. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3588

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ceragioli, Mary E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Court Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 09/23/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 4 Days; Comment: 96 hours ordered; Programs Authorized; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketReferral to DUI Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Ceragioli, Mary E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards CPD 22-03634

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ceragioli, Mary E; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ceragioli, Mary E; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ceragioli, Mary E; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ceragioli, Mary E; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W