This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 19:01:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Cash, Isaiah

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Cash, Isaiah. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Candela, Michael P, Shockley, Doris L and Reilley, James F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4870

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Candela, Michael P

Shockley, Doris L

Reilley, James F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cash, Isaiah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Lamb, Eric Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilley, James F; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time estimate 45 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Shockley, Doris L; 001; PC487(a)-F- Grand Theft Of Personal/Real Property Over $950; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny; 002; PC530.5(a)-F- Identity Theft; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Shockley, Doris L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Need Signed Statement of Rights and Signed O/R Conditions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney DJ. Lee CPD 21-05621

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Cash, Isaiah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCash, Isaiah; PC530.5(a)-F- Identity Theft; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCash, Isaiah; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCash, Isaiah; PC487(a)-F- Grand Theft Of Personal/Real Property Over $950; Statute: 487(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lamb, Eric Ryan