This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 22:02:47 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A, Caraway, Corie J and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0026

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Erpino, Michael Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Logs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Signed Probation Order, Payment Plan, Logs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Completion for Monitoring Program; Comment: Scram GPS Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed Probation Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School; Comment: Solutions For Positive Choices- 3M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Erpino, Michael Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; CPD 21-06560

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Carranzagarcia, Gabriel Angel; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erpino, Michael Thomas