This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Carey, Craig Cornelius

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Carey, Craig Cornelius. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Giordano, Raymond J, Caraway, Corie J and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2358

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Giordano, Raymond J

Caraway, Corie J

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Carey, Craig Cornelius

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Trailing mental health case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Defense Motion to Add on Calendar; set on 6/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMotion; Comment: Defense Motion to Add on Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC290.012(a)-F- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny; 002; PC290.015(a) -F- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Not Guilty; 002; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney S. Roose; CPD 22-02878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Carey, Craig Cornelius

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Carey, Craig Cornelius; 002; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Carey, Craig Cornelius; 002; Description: PC290.015(a) -F- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Statute: 290.015(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Carey, Craig Cornelius; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Carey, Craig Cornelius; 001; Description: PC290.012(a)-F- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Statute: 290.012(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher