This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 15:01:44 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. BURNS, PATRICK FERRELL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BURNS, PATRICK FERRELL. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Giordano, Raymond J, Shockley, Doris L, Heithecker, Philip H and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3529

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Giordano, Raymond J

Shockley, Doris L

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

BURNS, PATRICK FERRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shockley, Doris L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Possible 1538.5 motion; 30 minute time estimate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: 45 minute estimate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 30 Minute Time Estimate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: 30 Minute time estimate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney M. Tufaro BNTF 22-04778

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: BURNS, PATRICK FERRELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BURNS, PATRICK FERRELL; 002; Description: HS11379.6(a)-F- Manufacture Of Any Controlled Substance; Statute: 11379.6(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BURNS, PATRICK FERRELL; 001; Description: HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew