This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 20:00:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Buechner, Robert Joseph

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Buechner, Robert Joseph. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0152

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Buechner, Robert Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: PC853.7 Failure to Appear added 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Buechner, Robert Joseph; 002; Description: PC853.7-M- Failure To Appear; Statute: 853.7; Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Noel, CPD 22-07207 With Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Buechner, Robert Joseph; 001; Description: PC25400(a)(1)-M- Having Concealed Firearm In Vehicle; Statute: 25400(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less