This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 01:16:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Broussard, Ryan Keith

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Broussard, Ryan Keith. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3589

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Broussard, Ryan Keith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketRelease on Own Recognizance Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Broussard, Ryan Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney D. Garner BCSO 22-03846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Broussard, Ryan Keith; 001; Description: PC485-M- Theft Of Lost Property; Statute: 485; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.