This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 23:00:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Bradford, Leslie Lincoln

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bradford, Leslie Lincoln. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1755

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bradford, Leslie Lincoln

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Caraway, Christopher W.

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; HS11357(b)(2)-M- Person Over 18 In Possession of Marijuana Over 28.5g or Cannabis Over 4g; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC12500(a)-M- Driving Without Valid License; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C. Caraway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Bradford, Leslie Lincoln

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; CHPO M036-240-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bradford, Leslie Lincoln; 002; Description: VC12500(a)-M- Driving Without Valid License; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bradford, Leslie Lincoln; 001; Description: HS11357(b)(2)-M- Person Over 18 In Possession of Marijuana Over 28.5g or Cannabis Over 4g; Statute: 11357(b)(2); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.