This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 00:36:46 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Bradford, Christopher Joshua

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bradford, Christopher Joshua. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Caraway, Corie J, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Reilley, James F. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5696

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Caraway, Corie J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Reilley, James F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bradford, Christopher Joshua

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Lamb, Eric Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC1551-F- Fugitive From Justice; Dismissal After Hearing - Felony Fugitive From Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Status of Extradition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketExtradition Waiver PC1551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Reilley, James F; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketFugitive Complaint - PC1551; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Lee, CPD 21-06617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketArraignment - Felony Fugitive; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Bradford, Christopher Joshua

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bradford, Christopher Joshua; 001; Description: PC1551-F- Fugitive From Justice; Statute: 1551; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lamb, Eric Ryan