This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 01:11:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Boyd, Benjamin Leroy

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Boyd, Benjamin Leroy. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Chandler, Christopher R, Heryford, Eric L and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0031

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chandler, Christopher R

Worley, Kurt W

Heryford, Eric L

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Boyd, Benjamin Leroy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Bench Warrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketWarrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Held Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketWarrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Bench Warrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketWarrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Recall Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Arrest Warrant Issued to Butte County Sheriff's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketOrder on Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Stark-Modlin: BCSO 21-07426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Boyd, Benjamin Leroy; 002; Description: PC290.015(a) -F- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Statute: 290.015(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Boyd, Benjamin Leroy; 004; Description: PC290.011(a)-M- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Statute: 290.011(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Boyd, Benjamin Leroy; 001; Description: PC290.015(a) -F- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Statute: 290.015(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Boyd, Benjamin Leroy; 003; Description: PC290.011(a)-M- Failure To Comply With Sex Offender Registration Requirements; Statute: 290.011(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher