This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 23:06:35 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Giordano, Raymond J, Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3363

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Giordano, Raymond J

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketProbation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 003; VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; No Contest; 002; VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Admit; 002; VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney S Roose; PPD 22-0570

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Prior enhancements needs subsection; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; Public Defender: Bently, Matthew Cristopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 003; Description: VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 002; Description: VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Statute: 23546; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 002; Description: VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Statute: 23546; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 001; Description: VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Statute: 23546; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 001; Description: VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Statute: 23546; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bowers, Marlon Mckenzie; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher