This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 21:04:59 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Booth, Matthew Darius

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Booth, Matthew Darius. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2994

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Booth, Matthew Darius

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Davis, Grady M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Needs to sign amended conditions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney JJ. Stark-Modlin OPD 22-2063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Booth, Matthew Darius

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Booth, Matthew Darius; 001; Description: PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davis, Grady M