This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 22:08:26 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. BLINSTON, RANDY ALLEN

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BLINSTON, RANDY ALLEN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2998

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

BLINSTON, RANDY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: BLINSTON, RANDY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; BCSO 22-02520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BLINSTON, RANDY ALLEN; 001; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.