This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/07/2022 at 09:16:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2917

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Marquez, Roberto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Information Filed 10/11/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Arraignment on Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Information Filed 10/11/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: People to file an Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketRequest to Set Bail to No Bail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney M. Tufaro; FG220530NORFW0105

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketBail Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: People's Request To Set Bail At No Bail Due To Public Safety Concerns

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony; 001; Description: PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony; 001; Description: PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony; 001; Description: VC2800.2(a)-F- Evading An Officer With Willful Disregard; Statute: 2800.2(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Birdsong, Nathaniel Anthony; 001; Description: VC2800.2(a)-F- Evading An Officer With Willful Disregard; Statute: 2800.2(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marquez, Roberto