This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/12/2022 at 00:00:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Bennett, Clinton David

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bennett, Clinton David. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1817

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bennett, Clinton David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Williams, Benjamin A.

Caraway, Christopher W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Order on Communication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Additionally Sent to Benjamin Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOrder on Communication; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Comment: Communication Recevied 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCommunication; Comment: From Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; Terminal Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 04/28/2022; Concurrent: concurrent with any other; Term Type: Jail; Term: 30 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C. Caraway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen; CPD 22-02233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Bennett, Clinton David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Bennett, Clinton David; 001; Description: PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; Statute: 484(a)-488-490.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.