This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 21:07:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. BARKUS, VARENIA BEA

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARKUS, VARENIA BEA. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3734

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

BARKUS, VARENIA BEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketRelease on Own Recognizance Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Dupre-tokos; BCSO 22-05182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: BARKUS, VARENIA BEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BARKUS, VARENIA BEA; 003; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BARKUS, VARENIA BEA; 002; Description: PC602(m)-M- Trespass By Unauthorized Entering And Occupying; Statute: 602(m); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BARKUS, VARENIA BEA; 001; Description: PC69(a)-M- Forcible Obstruction Of Executive Officer; Statute: 69(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.