This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 00:14:26 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. BALLINGER, COLBY ETHAN

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BALLINGER, COLBY ETHAN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Chandler, Christopher R, Candela, Michael P and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2996

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chandler, Christopher R

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

BALLINGER, COLBY ETHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Williams, Benjamin A.

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: B Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 7/28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed By Deputy District Attorney T Vercruyssen; CSU 22-0275

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: BALLINGER, COLBY ETHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BALLINGER, COLBY ETHAN; 001; Description: PC242-M- Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher