This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 22:03:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Candela, Michael P and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2267

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Candela, Michael P

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: THe 136.2 PC order needs amended, the name is missing in the box "person to be restrained" and the date of birth listed 8/27/22 is not valid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketWork Program Time Sheet; Comment: Hours Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DispositionAmended Formal Probation; 002; PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Formal Probation; 003; PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Formal Probation; 004; PC594(b)(1)-F- Vandalism Over $400 Damage; Formal Probation; 005; PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Formal Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 05/24/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 364 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 209 Days; Probation; Status; Comment: Transfer In Accepted; Status: Active; Date: 05/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Modified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Order - Modified and Reinstated; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Addres special condition #14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketProgress Report; Comment: New Beginnings Counseling Centers, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DispositionAmended Formal Probation; 002; PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Formal Probation; 003; PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Formal Probation; 004; PC594(b)(1)-F- Vandalism Over $400 Damage; Formal Probation; 005; PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Formal Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 05/24/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 364 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 209 Days; Probation; Status; Comment: Transfer In Accepted; Status: Active; Date: 05/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DispositionPlea; 003; PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; No Contest; 002; PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; No Contest; 004; PC594(b)(1)-F- Vandalism Over $400 Damage; No Contest; 005; PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • ChargeCharges: BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI; 005; Description: PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • ChargeCharges: BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI; 004; Description: PC594(b)(1)-F- Vandalism Over $400 Damage; Statute: 594(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • ChargeCharges: BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI; 003; Description: PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • ChargeCharges: BAIDES, ANDREW GIOVANNI; 002; Description: PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J