This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 20:01:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Arroyo, April Lynn

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Arroyo, April Lynn. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5180

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Arroyo, April Lynn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Marshall, Robert L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney D Garner; BNTF 21-05851

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Arroyo, April Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • ChargeArroyo, April Lynn; PC1203.073(b)(2) - Health And Safety Conviction: Probation Ineligible; Statute: 1203.073(b)(2); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • ChargeArroyo, April Lynn; HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • ChargeArroyo, April Lynn; PC1203.073(b)(2) - Health And Safety Conviction: Probation Ineligible; Statute: 1203.073(b)(2); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • ChargeArroyo, April Lynn; HS11379(a)-F- Sale/Furnish/Transport Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11379(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall, Robert L