This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 20:01:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Arita, Jason J

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Arita, Jason J. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4539

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Arita, Jason J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Erpino, Michael Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Need statement of rights and stipulation for commissioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Erpino, Michael Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice To Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney M. Grow; CPD 21-00469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2021
  • ChargeArita, Jason J; HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11350(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2021
  • ChargeArita, Jason J; PC30305(a)(1)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2021
  • ChargeArita, Jason J; PC29825(b)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29825(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erpino, Michael Thomas