This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 20:02:04 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Apel, Christopher Delmar

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Apel, Christopher Delmar. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Giordano, Raymond J, Merrifield, Kimberly and Reilley, James F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4547

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Giordano, Raymond J

Merrifield, Kimberly

Reilley, James F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Apel, Christopher Delmar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M.

Henson, Saul W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Reilley, James F; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: Time Estimate: 30 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Act Fast Bail Bonds AS100161797

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Reilley, James F; 001; PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; 002; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Not Guilty; 003; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny; 002; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: N. Diamond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Reilley, James F; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Furry; BNTF 21-05092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Apel, Christopher Delmar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeApel, Christopher Delmar; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeApel, Christopher Delmar; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeApel, Christopher Delmar; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeApel, Christopher Delmar; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeApel, Christopher Delmar; PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henson, Saul W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.