This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 11:21:45 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs ANDREWS, DUSTIN JAY

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ANDREWS, DUSTIN JAY. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0371

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

ANDREWS, DUSTIN JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DispositionParole/Post Release Community Supervision; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Parole/Post Release Community Supervision; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 01/27/2023; Term Type: Jail; Term: 180 Days; Comment: Sentenced with time loss. Probation has the discretion to release Defendant. Defendant ordered to report to Probation 1 business day following release.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Admitted Violation (PCS/Parole/Mandatory Supervision)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Admit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Reinstated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Revoked

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketArraignment Violation - Post Release Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketPetition - Revoke Post Release Community Supervision

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: ANDREWS, DUSTIN JAY; 001; Description: PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455; Level: Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less